Jackson v. Standard Mortgage Corp et al
Plaintiff: Samantha J Jackson
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp and Standard Mortgage Corp
Case Number: 6:2018cv00927
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp, Federal National Mortgage Association, Standard Mortgage Corp with Jury Demand filed by Samantha J Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Bunting, M)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp, Federal National Mortgage Association, Standard Mortgage Corp (crt,Devillier, W)
August 3, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Samantha J Jackson in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 64635007260. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/18/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 13, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samantha J Jackson. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp, Federal National Mortgage Association and Standard Mortgage Corp with Jury Demand filed by Samantha J Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Standard Mortgage Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Mortgage Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?