Garry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Roxanne Robert Garry
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2018cv01005
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Roxanne Robert Garry. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 8/22/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lane, Matthew)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Chicola, C)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/8/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 3, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roxanne Robert Garry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP application, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lane, Matthew)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for judicial review under 42 USC 405g against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Roxanne Robert Garry. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Roxanne Robert Garry(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Robert Garry
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?