Hayes et al v. F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ron Addison Hayes and Brandie Hayes
Defendant: David McCoy, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Company, A B C Insurance Co, F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc and Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co
Undetermined: F & M Specialty Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01102
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Lydia H Toso for F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, and Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/12/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization and Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Aon P L C for Healthcare Providers Service Organization. (aty,Moffett, Harry) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add and correct Corporate Parent (Dauterive, C).
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co re #14 Order to Show Cause,. (aty,Moffett, Harry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Lydia Habliston Toso to Enroll as Counsel by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moffett, Harry)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Harry M. Moffett, IV, counsel for F & M Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Company, and Healthcare Providers Service Organization, show cause in writing within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, why he has not complied with the Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/9/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 Second Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(aty,Moffett, Harry)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 11/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Ron Addison Hayes. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,David, Blake)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Harry M Moffett, IV on behalf of F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2018. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #4 REMOVAL ORDER by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(aty,Moffett, Harry) Modified on 9/10/2018 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney James C Young, Micholle Walker Mordock for David McCoy. Attorney Harry M Moffett, IV terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/30/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney James C. Young in place of Harry M. Moffett, IV as to David McCoy only with consent by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moffett, Harry) Modified on 8/29/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
August 28, 2018 REFUND of duplicate $400.00 filing fee paid on 08/27/18, receipt #3737663, has been completed; counsel requested to confirm this refund on next credit card statement. (crt,Williams, C)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/28/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Harry M Moffett, IV on behalf of F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/11/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemental, Second Supplemental Complaint, with Jury Demand, by F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDING COMPLAINT against F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co filed by Ron Addison Hayes, Brandie Hayes. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING COMPLAINT against F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc, Healthcare Providers Service Organization, David McCoy, Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co filed by Ron Addison Hayes, Brandie Hayes. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2016-0475 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3737694) filed by F & M Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Company, David McCoy, Healthcare Providers Service Organization. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Consent to Removal of Action)(Attorney Harry M Moffett, IV added to party F & M Specialty Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:selreq), Attorney Harry M Moffett, IV added to party Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Harry M Moffett, IV added to party David McCoy(pty:dft), Attorney Harry M Moffett, IV added to party Healthcare Providers Service Organization(pty:dft))(aty,Moffett, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes et al v. F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McCoy
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Represented By: Micholle Walker Mordock
Represented By: James C Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Providers Service Organization
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Represented By: Lydia H Toso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & M Specialty Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Represented By: Lydia H Toso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacist Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Represented By: Lydia H Toso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: F & M Specialty Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Harry M Moffett, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Addison Hayes
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandie Hayes
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?