Cauley v. U S A
Plaintiff: Michaelle Avalon Cauley
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 6:2018cv01158
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to James Steven Gates on behalf of Michaelle Avalon Cauley regarding #3 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Action taken: Service of the complaint on the USA defendant is not complete; therefore answer deadline has been terminated and service executed date removed. (crt,Putch, A)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U S Attorney by Michaelle Avalon Cauley. (aty,Gates, James) Modified on 11/1/2018 to remove answer deadline and service executed date as to USA (Putch, A).
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Postal Service (crt,Putch, A)
September 5, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Putch, A)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3745221) filed by Michaelle Avalon Cauley. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James Steven Gates added to party Michaelle Avalon Cauley(pty:pla))(aty,Gates, James) Modified on 9/7/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cauley v. U S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaelle Avalon Cauley
Represented By: James Steven Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?