Misquitta v. Warden, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center
Defendant: Warden, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center and Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Petitioner: Neale Misquitta
Case Number: 6:2018cv01175
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Neale Misquitta of Filing of Opening Brief with BIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: BIA FIling)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
October 30, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2018 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter: LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number: (337)593-5221. Total pages: 31. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (crt,Bourque, L)
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert R Summerhays: MOTION HEARING held on 10/19/2018 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Neale Misquitta. (Court Reporter: LaRae E Bourque) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (crt,Jordan, P)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER withdrawing #16 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; granting #18 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/18/2018. (crt,Jordan, P)
October 18, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-IJ Decision, #2 Exhibit B-IJ Decision, #3 Exhibit C-BIA Brf ex, #4 Exhibit D-BIA Brf ext, #5 Exhibit E-Gov.Brf, #6 Exhibit F-RR obj., #7 Exhibit G-9th Cir.brf)(aty,Walker, Cristina)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Neale Misquitta re #18 Motion to Withdraw. (aty,Banias, Bradley)
October 15, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #18 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Haik, K)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Neale Misquitta. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (aty,Banias, Bradley)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Robert R Summerhays: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/15/2018. The hearing scheduled for October 19, 2018 will proceed as forward and will address issues raised within the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The defendant will respond to the Petition prior to the hearing. Plaintiff will withdraw the Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. (crt,Jordan, P)
October 12, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #16 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Haik, K)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Neale Misquitta. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion day set for 10/19/2018 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 10/4/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Neale Misquitta. (aty,Banias, Bradley)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Neale Misquitta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Email)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Walker, Cristina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A-Other Petition, #3 Exhibit B-Email)(aty,Walker, Cristina)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney William Brock Most for Neale Misquitta. Attorney Rose A Murray terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/28/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 27, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Haik, K)
September 27, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Neale Misquitta re #8 Motion for TRO,. (aty,Banias, Bradley)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Neale Misquitta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A: Maniar Order, #3 Exhibit B: Removal Order, #4 Exhibit C: "Notice to Appear", #5 Exhibit D: Letters of Support)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Neale Misquitta. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A: Email to USAO, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney William Most in place of Rose Murray with consent by Neale Misquitta. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Banias, Bradley)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Bradley Banias on behalf of Neale Misquitta regarding #4 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect correct answer due date for service on USA. (crt,Haik, K)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neale Misquitta. Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center served on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Service)(aty,Banias, Bradley) Modified to correct answer due date on 9/26/2018 (Haik, K).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Bradley Banias for Neale Misquitta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/12/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 7, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Bradley Banias to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3747464) by Neale Misquitta. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Murray, Rose)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-3747449) filed by Neale Misquitta. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Maniar Report and Recommendations)(Attorney Rose A Murray added to party Neale Misquitta(pty:pet))(aty,Murray, Rose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misquitta v. Warden, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neale Misquitta
Represented By: Rose A Murray
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: Bradley Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Pine Prairie ICE Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?