Pozhidayev v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: Aleksey Pozhidayev
Defendant: Director of Dept of Homeland Security & Immigration & Customs Enforcement and Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 6:2018cv01182
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden Pine Prairie Correctional Center, ICE District Director, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/24/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
September 7, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635059863, filing fee $5) filed by Aleksey Pozhidayev. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pozhidayev v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksey Pozhidayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Dept of Homeland Security & Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?