Yacob v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Plaintiff: Yonas Yacob
Defendant: Warden and Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Case Number: 6:2018cv01183
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court regarding response to petition. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
September 24, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Yonas Yacob in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635059957. (crt,Adams, K)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 10/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Yonas Yacob. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yacob v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonas Yacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?