Mack Financial Services et al v. Sugarland Express L L C et al

Plaintiff: Mack Financial Services, VFS Leasing Co. and V F S Leasing Co
Defendant: Arabie Trucking Services, LLC, Sugarland Express, LLC, TAK, L.L.C., Sandy Arabie, Myrna Arabie, T A K L L C, Sugarland Express L L C and Arabie Trucking Services L L C
Case Number: 6:2018cv01303
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
0 Judge: Terry A Doughty
1 Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2018 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of Louisiana on 10/17/2018, assigned case number 2:18-cv-09606. (crt,Whidden, C)
October 15, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/11/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 10, 2018 2 Ex Parte MOTION to Transfer Case by Mack Financial Services, V F S Leasing Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Callihan, Lawton)
October 4, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Sugarland Express L L C, T A K L L C, Arabie Trucking Services L L C, Myrna Arabie and Sandy Arabie (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3772569) filed by Mack Financial Services, VFS Leasing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Z, #3 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Mack Financial Services(pty:pla), Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party VFS Leasing Co.(pty:pla))(aty,Callihan, Lawton) Modified on 10/9/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack Financial Services et al v. Sugarland Express L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Financial Services
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Gregory Fortier Rouchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VFS Leasing Co.
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V F S Leasing Co
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Gregory Fortier Rouchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arabie Trucking Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugarland Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAK, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Arabie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrna Arabie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T A K L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugarland Express L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arabie Trucking Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?