Kennerson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angela Wheeler Kennerson
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2018cv01344
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,FinnSld, P)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Angela Wheeler Kennerson. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 10/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Lane, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 12, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3778782) filed by Angela Wheeler Kennerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Angela Wheeler Kennerson(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennerson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Wheeler Kennerson
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?