Andrus v. Kent et al
Plaintiff: Crown Drilling Inc, Cypress Production Inc of Texas, Alipine Exploration Companies Inc and Elizabeth G Andrus
Defendant: Jana S Kent and Steven W Kent, III
Case Number: 6:2018cv01535
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by Alipine Exploration Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(aty,Furr, Brett)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE Opposition to Motions to Withdraw the Reference by Elizabeth G Andrus re #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court. (aty,Peck, Stewart) Modified to correct docket entry relationship and to edit docket text on 12/13/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CORRECTIVE NOTICE of Setting #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 26, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on Withdrawal of Reference. (crt,Tizeno, J)
November 21, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court filed by Jana S Kent, Steven W Kent, III. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Tizeno, J) Modified on 12/26/2018 to capture proper motion event (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrus v. Kent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Drilling Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Production Inc of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alipine Exploration Companies Inc
Represented By: Brett P Furr
Represented By: Michael A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth G Andrus
Represented By: Christopher T Caplinger
Represented By: Meredith Sue Grabill
Represented By: Stewart F Peck
Represented By: Stanley Jerome Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana S Kent
Represented By: Noel Steffes Melancon
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W Kent, III
Represented By: Noel Steffes Melancon
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?