Shoffiett v. Goode et al

Plaintiff: Mike D Shoffiett, Sr
Defendant: Jim Goode, Sr, Betty Goode, Mary Goode and Dale Goode
Case Number: 6:2018cv01545
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Terry A Doughty
1 Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Betty Goode, Dale Goode, Jim Goode, Sr, Mary Goode (crt,Chicola, C)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Reconsideration re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mike D Shoffiett, Sr, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's motion in granted and he shall be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/21/2018. (jud,Whitehurst, Carol)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Mike D Shoffiett, Sr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the petition being stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/14/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 27, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mike D Shoffiett, Sr. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betty Goode, Dale Goode, Jim Goode, Sr, Mary Goode filed by Mike D Shoffiett, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoffiett v. Goode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike D Shoffiett, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Goode, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?