Turbine Generation Services L L C et al v. G E Oil & Gas L L C et al
Plaintiff: Michel B Moreno, M O R D O H Holdings, Turbine Powered Technology L L C, Turbine Generation Services L L C and McIntyre Investments L L C
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas L L C and General Electric Co
Appellee: Turbine Powered Technology LLC, MORDOH Holdings, McIntyre Investments LLC and Turbine Generation Services LLC
Appellant: GE Oil & Gas LLC and General Electric Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv01584
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received filed by G E Oil & Gas L L C, General Electric Co. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 1/4/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER by G E Oil & Gas L L C, General Electric Co re #5 Motion for Leave to File,. (aty,Williams, Graham) Modified on 1/3/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
December 28, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the GE Defendants Motion to Withdraw the Reference with consent sought but not yet obtained by G E Oil & Gas L L C, General Electric Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading)(aty,Duck, John) Modified on 1/2/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received filed by McIntyre Investments L L C, Turbine Powered Technology L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(aty,Panagiotis, Diogenis)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of Setting #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau set for 2/14/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Setting #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/7/2018) (Thigpen, M).
December 6, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on Withdrawal of Reference. (crt,Tizeno, J)
December 4, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference from Bankruptcy Court filed by GE Oil & Gas LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A List of Parties and Attorneys, #3 Exhibit B Documents from 3rd Circuit Court of Appeals, #4 Exhibit C Def Exceptions Answers Defenses, #5 Exhibit D Schedule D, #6 Exhibit E Notice of Claims Bar Date, #7 USBC Docket Sheet)(crt,Tizeno, J) Modified on 12/21/2018 to capture Motion event (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turbine Generation Services L L C et al v. G E Oil & Gas L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Represented By: Diogenis C Panagiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORDOH Holdings
Represented By: Jeffrey R Fine
Represented By: Christopher D Kratovil
Represented By: Kyle D Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M McEachin
Represented By: Richard J Hymel
Represented By: Alison R Ashmore
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Joelle F Evans
Represented By: Homer Ed Barousse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: McIntyre Investments LLC
Represented By: Diogenis C Panagiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Turbine Generation Services LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R Fine
Represented By: Christopher D Kratovil
Represented By: Kyle D Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M McEachin
Represented By: Richard J Hymel
Represented By: Alison R Ashmore
Represented By: Homer Ed Barousse, Jr
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Joelle F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GE Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Represented By: John M Duck
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John M Duck
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel B Moreno
Represented By: Jeffrey R Fine
Represented By: Christopher D Kratovil
Represented By: Kyle D Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M McEachin
Represented By: Richard J Hymel
Represented By: Alison R Ashmore
Represented By: Homer Ed Barousse, Jr
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Joelle F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M O R D O H Holdings
Represented By: Jeffrey R Fine
Represented By: Christopher D Kratovil
Represented By: Kyle D Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M McEachin
Represented By: Richard J Hymel
Represented By: Alison R Ashmore
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Joelle F Evans
Represented By: Homer Ed Barousse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turbine Powered Technology L L C
Represented By: Diogenis C Panagiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turbine Generation Services L L C
Represented By: Jeffrey R Fine
Represented By: Christopher D Kratovil
Represented By: Kyle D Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M McEachin
Represented By: Richard J Hymel
Represented By: Alison R Ashmore
Represented By: Homer Ed Barousse, Jr
Represented By: Homer Edward Barousse, III
Represented By: Joelle F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McIntyre Investments L L C
Represented By: Diogenis C Panagiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Oil & Gas L L C
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Represented By: John M Duck
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co
Represented By: John M Duck
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?