C M Construction & Excavation L L C v. Worley Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: CM Construction & Excavation, LLC. and C M Construction & Excavation L L C
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company, Worley Services, Inc, SureTec Insurance Co and Worley Services Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00048
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SureTec Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for SureTec Insurance Co. (aty,James, David)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER. It is hereby ordered that oral argument on the Motion to Transfer Case or Dismiss [Doc. #10] is CANCELLED. The motion will be decided on the briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/14/2019. (crt,Gardner, C)
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue under Rule 12(b)(3). Motion day set for 4/18/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Reeves, T)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Consolidation by Clerk (crt,Putch, A)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 6:19-cv-00048. Member Case Number(s): 6:19-cv-00218. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/12/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew F Carter for SureTec Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/8/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Andrew F. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3892173) by SureTec Insurance Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,James, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint, sent to David Earl James on behalf of SureTec Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/15/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer case under Rule 12(b)(3) MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Brian Wesley Capell on behalf of Worley Services Inc regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer case under Rule 12(b)(3) for improper venue and MOTION to Expedite. Action taken: Modified to remove motion relief to Expedite as request not contained in pdf. Modified #11 MOTION to Consolidate Case to edit text to correct case number to reflect as Lafayette division case, 6:19-cv-00218. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Worley Services Inc. (aty,Capell, Brian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Worley Services Inc.(aty,Capell, Brian)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Worley Services Inc regarding #12 Notice (Other),. Action taken: Terminated #12 Notice and modified docket text to indicate pleading filed in error in wrong case. (crt,Crick, S)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE by Worley Services Inc of Related Case and Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Capell, Brian) Modified on 2/28/2019 to indicate electronically filed in error. Pleading filed in wrong case. (Crick, S).
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 6:19-cv-00218 with consent sought but not yet obtained by Worley Services Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo in Support)(aty,Capell, Brian) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text to correct case number to reflect as Lafayette division case (Reeves, T).
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue under Rule 12(b)(3) by Worley Services Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposd Order, #2 Memo in Support)(Attorney Brian Wesley Capell added to party Worley Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Capell, Brian) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text and remove reference to motion to expedite relief since not requested in pdf and add Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue relief (Reeves, T).
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Suretec Insurance Co.(Attorney David Earl James added to party Suretec Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,James, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Worley Services Inc served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture answer due date, as this document was electronically filed in error as 8 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Putch, A) Modified on 2/22/2019 to add document number (Putch, A).
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Suretec Insurance Co served on 2/07/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture answer due date, as this document was electronically filed in error as 7 Affidavit of Service.(crt,Putch, A) Modified on 2/22/2019 to add document number (Putch, A).
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Worley Services Inc served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (aty,Reynolds, Timothy) Modified on 2/22/2019 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A).
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Suretec Insurance Co served on 2/07/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (aty,Reynolds, Timothy) Modified on 2/22/2019 to more accurately identify the pleading submitted (Putch, A).
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. (aty,Reynolds, Timothy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Thomas E St Germain on behalf of C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suretec Insurance Co, Worley Services Inc (crt,Putch, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Thomas E St Germain on behalf of C M Construction & Excavation L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/5/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. (aty,St Germain, Thomas) Modified on 1/22/2019 to replace Main Document 2 with non-fillable form (Putch, A).
January 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Putch, A)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Worley Services Inc, Suretec Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3851123) filed by C M Construction & Excavation L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Thomas E St Germain added to party C M Construction & Excavation L L C.(pty:pla))(aty,St Germain, Thomas) Modified on 1/16/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C M Construction & Excavation L L C v. Worley Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM Construction & Excavation, LLC.
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C M Construction & Excavation L L C
Represented By: Timothy K Reynolds
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Represented By: John Haas Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SureTec Insurance Co
Represented By: Andrew F Carter
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Services Inc
Represented By: Brian Wesley Capell
Represented By: Court C VanTassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?