Bradley v. Mountain Lake Risk et al

Plaintiff: George Fiorucci and Wilfred Bradley
Defendant: Mountain Lake Risk, U.S. Xpress, Inc. and U S Xpress Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00056
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Patrick J Hanna
1 Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U S Xpress Inc identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc. for U S Xpress Inc. (aty,Dill, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Answer to Complaint, sent to James M Dill on behalf of U S Xpress Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/6/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by U S Xpress Inc.(Attorney James M Dill added to party U S Xpress Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Dill, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by George Fiorucci.(Attorney James M Dill added to party George Fiorucci(pty:dft))(aty,Dill, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Fiorucci, Mountain Lake Risk, U S Xpress Inc (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Fiorucci, Mountain Lake Risk, U S Xpress Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3852509) filed by Wilfred Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Blake Rossi David added to party Wilfred Bradley(pty:pla))(aty,David, Blake) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Mountain Lake Risk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Lake Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Xpress Inc
Represented By: Gary Austin Love
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fiorucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Bradley
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?