Miller v. Royal Leasing Services, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Judy Miller
Defendant: Royal Leasing Services, Inc, Elliot Quinard, Total Insurance Services, Inc., Total Insurance Services Inc, Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co and Royal Leasing Services Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00235
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2020 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 5/15/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/20/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 6/12/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 12/19/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/19/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/19/2019. Discovery deadline 1/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2020. Daubert Motions due by 2/18/2020. Motions in Limine due by 5/18/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2020. Bench Books due by 6/2/2020. Trial Depositions due by 6/2/2020. Real Time glossary due by 6/9/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 6/9/2020.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 4/24/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co, Elliot Quinard, Royal Leasing Services Inc . (aty,Hoffmann, Franklin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Leasing Services Inc. (aty,Hoffmann, Franklin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co. (aty,Hoffmann, Franklin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit F by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co, Elliot Quinard, Royal Leasing Services Inc, Total Insurance Services Inc re #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/28/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/28/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Franklin A Hoffmann on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/13/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Franklin A Hoffmann on behalf of Royal Leasing Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/13/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint, by Elliot Quinard in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #11 (page 69) of Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P) Modified on 2/27/2019 to show the answer was for the original complaint too. (Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Royal Leasing Services Inc filed in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #11 (page 60) of Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint, by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co filed in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #11 (page 52) to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Royal Leasing Services Inc filed in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in attachment 11 (page 31) to Document #1, Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co filed by Judy Miller in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT 6 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Mitchell, P)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Elliot Quinard, Royal Leasing Services, Inc, Total Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Hoffmann, Franklin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 13th JDC Evangeline Parish, Case Number 77,722 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3884923) filed by Total Insurance Services, Inc., Elliot Quinard, Royal Leasing Services, Inc and Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Verification, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 Exhibit A Petition, #5 Exhibit B Ans to RFA, #6 Exhibit C First Supp and Am Petition, #7 Exhibit D Affidavit of Cernenichi, #8 Exhibit E Amended Ans to RFA, #9 Exhibit F FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit G State Court Written Notice, #11 Exhibit H Suit Record)(Attorney Franklin A Hoffmann added to party Elliot Quinard(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin A Hoffmann added to party Royal Leasing Services, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin A Hoffmann added to party Total Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Hoffmann, Franklin) Modified on 2/27/2019 to indicate who filed notice of removal. (Mitchell, P) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/27/2019) (Mitchell, P). Modified on 2/27/2019 to replace the print buttons on civil cover sheet. (Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Royal Leasing Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Leasing Services, Inc
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Quinard
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Represented By: Madaline Gaile King
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Insurance Services Inc
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Co
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Represented By: Madaline Gaile King
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Leasing Services Inc
Represented By: Franklin A Hoffmann
Represented By: Madaline Gaile King
Represented By: Laura Beth Matthews
Represented By: Lottie L Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Miller
Represented By: Marcus Lee Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?