Latiolais v. USA

Plaintiff: Emmett Latiolais
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 6:2019cv00363
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. USA answer due 7/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/4/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by USA. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party USA(pty:dft))(aty,Williams-Auzenne, Desiree)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 21, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Emmett Latiolais. (aty,Benoit, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3905557) filed by Emmett Latiolais.(Attorney David D Benoit added to party Emmett Latiolais(pty:clm))(aty,Benoit, David) Modified on 3/21/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latiolais v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Latiolais
Represented By: Justin Ryan Cantu
Represented By: David D Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Desiree C Williams-Auzenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?