Williams v. Greenwich Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Williams
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Co, John R Willis and Landes Trucking Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00390
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Motions referred to Magistrate Judge: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(3) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(3). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01750. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana, Lafayette Division. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/27/2019.(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(3) . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silbert, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(3) by Greenwich Insurance Company, Landes Trucking, Inc., John R Willis. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney John David Harpole, III added to party Greenwich Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John David Harpole, III added to party Landes Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John David Harpole, III added to party John R Willis(pty:dft).(Harpole, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greenwich Insurance Company, Landes Trucking, Inc., John R. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7449734) filed by Jeffrey T Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Scott Eric Silbert added to party Jeffrey T Williams(pty:pla).(Silbert, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Greenwich Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Williams
Represented By: Scott E Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Co
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: John David Harpole
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Sauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Willis
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: John David Harpole
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Sauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landes Trucking Inc
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Represented By: John David Harpole
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Sauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?