Cook v. Air Evac E M S Inc

Plaintiff: Stephanie Cook
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc. and Air Evac E M S Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00478
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Stay Proceeding. Motion day set for 8/8/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a hearing is hereby SET for August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. for the Motion to Stay (Rec. Doc. 10) filed by Plaintiff. Oppositions to the Motion are due 21 days from the date of service of the Motion. Plaintiff may reply within 7 days of service of the opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/2/2019. (crt,Coreil, H)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceeding by Stephanie Cook. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Russell, Sera)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/24/2019. (crt,Coreil, H)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 01:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/12/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/16/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 8/9/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/26/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/24/2020. Discovery deadline 2/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2020. Daubert Motions due by 3/24/2020. Motions in Limine due by 6/22/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/22/2020. Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2020. Bench Books due by 7/8/2020. Trial Depositions due by 7/8/2020. Real Time glossary due by 7/15/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 7/15/2020.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 6/21/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Air Evac E M S Inc.(aty,Williams, Douglas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Air Evac E M S Inc . (aty,Williams, Douglas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air Evac E M S Inc identifying Corporate Parent Air Medical Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Global Medical Response, Inc., Corporate Parent GMR Intermediate Corp., Corporate Parent GMR Buyer Corp. for Air Evac E M S Inc. (aty,Williams, Douglas)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/22/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Douglas Kent Williams, Christopher D Billings, Kelsey Ann Clark, Katherine M Cook on behalf of Air Evac E M S Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 19-C-1170-C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3925291) filed by Air Evac EMS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party, #5 Exhibit State Court Suit Record, #6 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process)(Attorney Douglas Kent Williams added to party Air Evac EMS, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Air Evac E M S Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac E M S Inc
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Clark
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Cook
Represented By: Sera H Russell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?