Harper v. Griffin

Plaintiff: Lisa Harper
Defendant: Lisa Griffin
Case Number: 6:2019cv00527
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 7/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) by Lisa Griffin. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration)(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
May 21, 2019 MOTION AND ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw Jamie I Schutte as attorney of record by Lisa Harper. (filed in 15th JDC, Parish of Vermillion, Case #105937, signed on 4/30/2019). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY attached to PDF document #4 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Lisa Griffin answer due 5/2/2019. (15th JDC, Parish of Vermillion, Case #105937,filed 12/18/2018). Attached to Response to Removal Order #4 . (crt,Bunting, M)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Lisa Griffin . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court record, #2 Exhibit B-State Court ledger)(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/26/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Vermilion Parish, Case Number 105937 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by Lisa Griffin. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Gvmt Ex 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit Gvmt Ex 2 - Declaration, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jennifer B Frederick added to party Lisa Griffin(pty:dft))(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Griffin
Represented By: Jennifer B Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Harper
Represented By: Sera H Russell, III
Represented By: Jamie Schutte Thistlethwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?