Porter et al v. Chase Bank U S A N A
Plaintiff: Sandra C. Porter, Samuel G. Porter, Samuel G Porter and Sandra C Porter
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A. and Chase Bank U S A N A
Case Number: 6:2019cv00558
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Chase Bank U S A N A for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Bank U S A N A identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank U S A N A. (aty,Wilbourn, Jonathan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Second Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jonathan G Wilbourn, Amanda Strickland Stout on behalf of Chase Bank U S A N A. Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of SECOND Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jonathan G Wilbourn, Amanda Strickland Stout on behalf of Chase Bank U S A N A. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/3/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P) Modified on 5/20/2019 to add this is second notice. (Mitchell, P)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chase Bank U S A N A answer due 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/15/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Chase Bank U S A N A. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Wilbourn, Jonathan) Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/3/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jonathan G Wilbourn, Amanda Strickland Stout on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/16/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 1, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Chase Bank USA, N.A. answer due 5/8/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 20192177 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3937928) filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jonathan G Wilbourn added to party Chase Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft))(aty,Wilbourn, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter et al v. Chase Bank U S A N A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan G Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank U S A N A
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Represented By: Jonathan G Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra C. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel G. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel G Porter
Represented By: Charles M Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra C Porter
Represented By: Charles M Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?