Dugas v. Ace American Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Rachel Dugas and Gilbert Dugas
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Mark Strauss, CRST Expedited, Inc., Pilot Travel Centers L L C Store #274, Pilot Travel Center L L C, Ace American Insurance Co and C R S T Expedited Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00630
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/9/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 (ISSUED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint sent to Thomas J Cortazzo on behalf of Pilot Travel Center L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (crt,Putch, A) Modified on 6/6/2019 to indicated that this Notice was entered in error as this party was dismissed in state court. (Mitchell, P)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/22/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, by Pilot Travel Center L L C. (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, First Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Pilot Travel Center L L C. (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Security Insurance Co.(Attorney Sean Paul Rabalais added to party Progressive Security Insurance Co(pty:dft))(crt,Thigpen, M) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
May 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemental & Amending with Jury Demand, by Ace American Insurance Company. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, Ace American Insurance Company, CRST Expedited, Inc., Pilot Travel Centers L L C Store #274, Progressive Security Insurance Co, Mark Strauss filed by Rachel Dugas, Gilbert Dugas. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRST Expedited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Admiralty Holdings, Inc. for CRST Expedited, Inc.. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ace American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corp. for Ace American Insurance Company. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Request for Notice re #1 Notice of Removal by Ace American Insurance Co, C R S T Expedited Inc, Mark Strauss. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by Mark Strauss.(aty,Smith Auld, Renee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party re #1 Notice of Removal by Ace American Insurance Co, C R S T Expedited Inc, Mark Strauss. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of Filing of State Court Record re #1 Notice of Removal Ace American Insurance Co, C R S T Expedited Inc, Mark Strauss. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Ace American Insurance Co, C R S T Expedited Inc, Mark Strauss. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Verification re #1 Notice of Removal by Ace American Insurance Co, C R S T Expedited Inc, Mark Strauss. (aty,Smith Auld, Renee) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin Parish, Case Number 85926 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3950351) filed by Mark Strauss, CRST Expedited, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Pilot Dismissal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Progressive Dismissal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - State Court Removal, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Renee F Smith Auld added to party Ace American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Renee F Smith Auld added to party CRST Expedited, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Renee F Smith Auld added to party Mark Strauss(pty:dft))(aty,Smith Auld, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugas v. Ace American Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Renee F Smith Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Co
Represented By: Sean Paul Rabalais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Strauss
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Renee F Smith Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Renee F Smith Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers L L C Store #274
Represented By: Thomas J Cortazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Center L L C
Represented By: Thomas J Cortazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Renee F Smith Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R S T Expedited Inc
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Renee F Smith Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Dugas
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Jerome Harold Moroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Dugas
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Jerome Harold Moroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?