Guillot v. Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co

Plaintiff: BRYAN SCOTT GUILLOT
Defendant: Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv00633
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2020 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/10/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 8/7/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/20/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/20/2019. Discovery deadline 1/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2020. Daubert Motions due by 2/18/2020. Motions in Limine due by 5/18/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2020. Bench Books due by 6/3/2020. Trial Depositions due by 6/3/2020. Real Time glossary due by 6/10/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 6/10/2020.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 6/19/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/20/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services Inc for Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Minkin, Reed)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15TH JDC LAFAYETTE PARISH, Case Number C-20190579 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3950782) filed by Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 LIST OF PARTIES AND PLEADINGS, #6 VERIFICATION)(Attorney Reed Steven Minkin added to party Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Minkin, Reed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillot v. Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN SCOTT GUILLOT
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Reed Steven Minkin
Represented By: Michael R Sistrunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?