Harvey et al v. A B C Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel W Harvey and Rachelle Harvey
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company, A B C Insurance Co, Ensco Offshore Co, X Y Z Insurance Co, Ensco Rowan P L C and Offshore Energy Services Inc
Not Yet Classified: Offshore Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00648
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Ensco Rowan P L C . (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 State Court Filing Record, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(aty,Kraft, Ralph)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/3/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Offshore Energy Services Inc. (aty,Lemoine, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to Michael G Lemoine on behalf of Offshore Energy Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Offshore Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Offshore Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Ensco Rowan P L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ensco Rowan P L C. (aty,Kraft, Ralph) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit filer and to add corporate parent (Putch, A).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal of Defendant, Ensco Rowan plc from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2019-2119 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3953017) filed by ENSCO Offshore Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition State Court Petition and Discovery, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit Offshore Energy Services' Answer to Petition, #5 Proposed pleading Offshore Energy Services' Consent to Removal)(Attorney Ralph E Kraft added to party ENSCO Offshore Company(pty:dft))(aty,Kraft, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey et al v. A B C Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel W Harvey
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Richard C Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Harvey
Represented By: Robert Byrne Brahan
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Represented By: Richard C Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Offshore Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensco Offshore Co
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensco Rowan P L C
Represented By: Ralph E Kraft
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Michael G Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?