Cilici LLC v. Vision Acquisitions LLC
Plaintiff: Cilici LLC and Cilici L L C
Defendant: Vision Acquisitions LLC and Vision Acquisitions L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00668
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cilici L L C. (aty,Bowen, Candace)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Candace Lauren Bowen on behalf of Cilici L L C. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #4 Motion to Serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/31/2019. (jud,Whitehurst, Carol)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for US Marshal to Serve Summons and Complaint by Cilici L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Bowen, Candace) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Candace Lauren Bowen on behalf of Cilici L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vision Acquisitions L L C (crt,Putch, A)
May 24, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 4:19-cv-00668 from Opelousas Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:19-cv-0668. Case assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Putch, A)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Annul Tax Sale against Vision Acquisitions L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3957226) filed by Cilici L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Candace Lauren Bowen added to party Cilici L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Bowen, Candace) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cilici LLC v. Vision Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Acquisitions L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cilici LLC
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cilici L L C
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?