Durgin v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Glenn Durgin
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv00721
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co (crt,Crick, S)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 First Supplemental & Amending COMPLAINT against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Durgin.(crt,Crick, S)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/18/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Glenn Durgin. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,St Pe, Kenneth) Modified on 6/17/2019 to modify motion event to more accurately describe pleading, to modify docket text and create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co (crt,Crick, S)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Kenneth D St Pe on behalf of Glenn Durgin regarding #1 Complaint,. Action taken: modified to remove jury demand from entry since jury demand was not reflected in pleading filed. (crt,Crick, S)
June 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3967129) filed by Glenn Durgin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kenneth D St Pe added to party Glenn Durgin(pty:clm))(aty,St Pe, Kenneth) Modified to modify docket text and remove "with jury demand" from text on 6/10/2019 (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durgin v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Durgin
Represented By: Kenneth D St Pe
Represented By: Stephen B Murray
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Stephen B Murray, Jr
Represented By: John R Whaley
Represented By: Benjamin H Dampf
Represented By: Arthur Mahony Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?