Francis v. Ackal et al
Plaintiff: Maureen Francis and **Sanctioned/Barred* Maureen Francis
Defendant: City of New Iberia, Louis Ackal, Christopher Wilson, XYZ Insurance Company, Sheriffs Office Iberia Parish and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv00803
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson. Supplement to #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim against Sheriff Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(crt,Dauterive, C)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/29/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim against Sheriff Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson with consent sought but not yet obtained by Louis Ackal, Christopher Wilson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Mayeaux, Ben)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim against Sheriff Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson. Motion day set for 9/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Williams, L)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim against Sheriff Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson by Louis Ackal, Christopher Wilson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Mayeaux, Ben) Modified on 7/30/2019 to indicate supplemental document filed as document #13 (Dauterive, C).
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 8/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Louis Ackal, Sheriffs Office Iberia Parish, Christopher Wilson . (aty,Mayeaux, Ben)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Louis Ackal and Christopher Wilson are granted an additional twenty (20) days fromthis date within which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/1/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by City of New Iberia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Attorney Jason Thomas Reed added to party City of New Iberia(pty:dft))(aty,Reed, Jason) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Louis Ackal, Christopher Wilson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Mayeaux, Ben)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/25/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 24, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC Iberia Parish, Case Number 134232 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3981244) filed by Sheriffs Office Iberia Parish, Louis Ackal, Christopher Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Attorney Ben L Mayeaux added to party Louis Ackal(pty:selreq), Attorney Ben L Mayeaux added to party Sheriffs Office Iberia Parish(pty:selreq), Attorney Ben L Mayeaux added to party Christopher Wilson(pty:selreq))(aty,Mayeaux, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Ackal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* Maureen Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Iberia
Represented By: Jason Thomas Reed
Represented By: Nicholas Gene Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Ackal
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Represented By: Elizabeth Bailly Bloch
Represented By: Christopher Brechtel Ortte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wilson
Represented By: Ben L Mayeaux
Represented By: Elizabeth Bailly Bloch
Represented By: Christopher Brechtel Ortte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office Iberia Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?