Hannie Development Inc et al v. Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C et al
Plaintiff: Hannie Development Inc and Cedar Crest L L C
Defendant: Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C and Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00833
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
2 Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY: Plaintiffs' Response to #14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award is due by 9/12/2019. Defendants may file a reply 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/22/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/22/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Confirm Arbitration Award by Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C, Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- August 12, 2019 Final Award, #3 Exhibit 2- Rosewood HEA, #4 Exhibit 3- Cedar Crest HEA)(aty,Lemaire, Justin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Reopen/Reinstate Case by Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C, Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Cochran, Douglas)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT Denying and Dismissing With Prejudice #1 Motion to Modify or Alternatively Partially Vacate Arbitration Awards. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs is Denied. It Is Further Ordered that Defendants' request for attorneys' fees and costs is Denied. It Is Further Ordered that Defendants' request to hold this matter open is Denied. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/2/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM RULING re #1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Modify or Alternatively Partially Vacate Arbitration Awards filed by Cedar Crest L L C, Hannie Development Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/2/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Modify or Alternatively Partially Vacate Arbitration Awards filed by Cedar Crest L L C, Hannie Development Inc. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/23/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 22, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cedar Crest L L C, Hannie Development Inc. (aty,Phillips, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained by Cedar Crest L L C, Hannie Development Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit A)(aty,Phillips, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C, Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C identifying Corporate Parent Colonial Oaks Master Tenant L L C, Corporate Parent Colonial Oaks Master Tenant Holdings 1 for Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C, Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C (Attorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Lemaire, Justin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Modify or Alternatively Partially Vacate Arbitration Awards filed by Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C, Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(aty,Lemaire, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 7/3/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct judge assignment and correctly reflect signed by Judge Michael J Juneau (Dauterive, C).
July 3, 2019 CASE Reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Robert R Summerhays no longer assigned to the case. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to correct Judge assignment; see #4 Order of Transfer. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #4 Order of Transfer. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correct Judge assignment and to correctly reflect Order signed by Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C and Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cedar Crest L L C, Hannie Development Inc. (aty,Phillips, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Modify or Alternatively Partially Vacate Arbitration Awards (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3984401) filed by Hannie Development Inc and Cedar Crest L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Affidavit Exhibit K, #13 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel Josef Phillips added to party Cedar Crest, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Josef Phillips added to party Hannie Development Inc(pty:selreq))(aty,Phillips, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correctly identify pleading, create motion event and edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannie Development Inc et al v. Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannie Development Inc
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Crest L L C
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Oaks Memory Care Lafayette L L C
Represented By: Douglas J Cochran
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Oaks Assisted Living Lafayette L L C
Represented By: Douglas J Cochran
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?