Patin v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sharon Leblanc Patin
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00883
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sharon Leblanc Patin. Service made upon: U S Attorney;. (aty,Spurlock, Paul)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sharon Leblanc Patin. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 8/15/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney General;. (aty,Spurlock, Paul)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sharon Leblanc Patin. Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration served on 8/15/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Spurlock, Paul)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 10, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3994242) filed by Sharon Leblanc Patin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Proposed summons/writ Attorney General, #4 Proposed summons/writ U.S. Attorney)(Attorney Paul B Spurlock added to party Sharon Leblanc Patin(pty:pla))(aty,Spurlock, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Leblanc Patin
Represented By: Paul B Spurlock
Represented By: Paul Brian Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?