Lewis v. Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al
Plaintiff: Joel Lewis
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Jamaria J. Graham, USA Jireh Trans LLC, USA Transportation Services, LLC, U S A Jireh Trans L L C, U S A Transportation Services L L C and Jamaria J Graham
Case Number: 6:2019cv00895
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Lewis. Jamaria J Graham served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (aty,Chopin, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jamaria J Graham. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 16, 2019 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jamaria J Graham, requested by Joel Lewis. (aty,Chopin, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U S A Jireh Trans L L C, Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (aty,Jeansonne, Jordan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by U S A Jireh Trans L L C, Underwriters at Lloyds of London.(aty,Jeansonne, Jordan) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 8/16/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Richard A Chopin and Justin M Chopin for Joel Lewis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/6/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Jordan Michael Jeansonne on behalf of U S A Jireh Trans L L C, Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Show Cause Response due by 8/20/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Lewis. Jamaria J Graham served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed as 6 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Williams, L) Modified on 8/6/2019 to add document number (Williams, L).
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Damages and First set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents served on Jamaria Graham on 07/29/2019, filed by Joel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service and Citation)(aty,Page, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Chopin Law Firm to Enroll as Counsel by Joel Lewis. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Page, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/15/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Jordan Michael Jeansonne on behalf of U S A Jireh Trans L L C, Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/26/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in state court. U S A Transportation Services L L C answer due 7/18/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in attachment #5 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC - Iberia Parish, Case Number 134235 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3995604) filed by USA Jireh Trans LLC, Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 List of Parties, #10 List of Pleadings, #11 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Jordan Michael Jeansonne added to party USA Jireh Trans LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Michael Jeansonne added to party Underwriters at Lloyds of London(pty:dft))(aty,Jeansonne, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaria J. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Jireh Trans LLC
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Transportation Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S A Jireh Trans L L C
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S A Transportation Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaria J Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Lewis
Represented By: Brian Douglas Page
Represented By: Richard A Chopin
Represented By: Justin M Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?