Zip L L C v. Zachry Exploration L L C
Plaintiff: Zip, L L C and Zip L L C
Defendant: Zachry Exploration L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00902
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Zachry Exploration L L C. (aty,Montz, Charles)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #6 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion day set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Williams, L)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Zip L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Memorandum / Brief, #4 Proposed order, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Privat, Kenneth). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 8/7/2019 (Williams, L).
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Zachry Exploration L L C.(aty,Montz, Charles) Modified on 7/22/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Zachry Exploration L L C answer due 7/22/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zachry Exploration L L C. (aty,Bailey, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number 2019-10539 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3997243) filed by Zachry Exploration L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Documents)(Attorney Christopher B Bailey added to party Zachry Exploration L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Bailey, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zip L L C v. Zachry Exploration L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachry Exploration L L C
Represented By: Christopher B Bailey
Represented By: Charles W Montz, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Randazzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zip, L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zip L L C
Represented By: Kenneth O Privat
Represented By: Scott Joseph Privat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?