Colton v Marsal et al
Plaintiff: Chastity Colton and Chasity Colton
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Qualitas Insurance Company, Boza Williams Marsal, Mambo Transport, LLC, Qualitas Insurance Co, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co and Mambo Transport L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00905
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mambo Transport L L C. (aty,Pharr, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Mark R Pharr, III on behalf of Mambo Transport L L C. Show Cause Response due by 8/20/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Qualitas Insurance Co. (aty,Pharr, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mambo Transport L L C, Boza Williams Marsal, Qualitas Insurance Co regarding #5 Answer to Complaint . (aty,Pharr, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mambo Transport L L C, Boza Williams Marsal, Qualitas Insurance Co.(aty,Pharr, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2019) (Thigpen, M).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Mark R Pharr, III on behalf of Mambo Transport, LLC, Qualitas Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/30/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC, St. Martin Parish, Case Number 088059 D with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3997538) filed by Boza Williams Marsal, Mambo Transport, LLC, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, Qualitas Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Mark R Pharr, III added to party Boza Williams Marsal(pty:dft), Attorney Mark R Pharr, III added to party Mambo Transport, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark R Pharr, III added to party Qualitas Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Pharr, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colton v Marsal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitas Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boza Williams Marsal
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mambo Transport, LLC
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitas Insurance Co
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mambo Transport L L C
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Colton
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Fontcuberta
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Cristen Michelle Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?