Trahan v. Richard et al
Plaintiff: Danni Trahan
Defendant: Calvin Richard and Roxanne Gilton
Case Number: 6:2019cv00942
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Calvin Richard.(aty,Edwards, Roger) Modified on 9/9/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Roxanne Gilton.(Attorney George Andrew Veazey added to party Roxanne Gilton(pty:dft))(aty,Veazey, George)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Calvin Richard.(Attorney Roger Chadwick Edwards, Jr added to party Calvin Richard(pty:dft))(aty,Edwards, Roger)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danni Trahan. Roxanne Gilton served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Calvin Richard served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons for C. Richard)(aty,Stiegler, Charles)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Roxanne Gilbert and Calvin Richard on July 25, 2019, filed by Danni Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on C. Richard)(aty,Stiegler, Charles) Modified on 7/30/2019 to reflect "Filed in Error"; corrected and refiled as #4 Summons Returned Executed (Dauterive, C).
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roxanne Gilton and Calvin Richard. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roxanne Gilton and Calvin Richard with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4004489) filed by Danni Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for C. Richard, #2 Summons for R. Gilton, #3 Civil cover sheet, #4 Consent Form of D. Trahan)(Attorney Charles Joseph Stiegler added to party Danni Trahan(pty:pla))(aty,Stiegler, Charles) Modified on 7/23/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trahan v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Richard
Represented By: Roger Chadwick Edwards, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Gilton
Represented By: George Andrew Veazey
Represented By: Bradford H Felder
Represented By: Rebecca Klayre Bayless
Represented By: Dona K Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danni Trahan
Represented By: Charles Joseph Stiegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?