Attales v. Columbia Gulf Transmission Co L L C
Plaintiff: Darrel W Attales
Defendant: Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C and Columbia Gulf Transmission Co L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00979
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/10/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/15/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 11/7/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/23/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/24/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/23/2020. Discovery deadline 5/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2020. Daubert Motions due by 6/22/2020. Motions in Limine due by 9/21/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/21/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2020. Bench Books due by 10/6/2020. Trial Depositions due by 10/6/2020. Real Time glossary due by 10/13/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 10/13/2020.Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 9/19/2019. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2019. Following discussion, a jury trial date of November 2, 2020 and a pretrial date of October 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. were selected. A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: CRD Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 01:30 PM by phone.(crt,Guidry, C)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Due to prior scheduling conflict, plaintiff's counsel has requested that the 9/18/19 10:00 Telephone Scheduling Conference with the Courtroom Deputy be rescheduled. The Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on September 19, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on September 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (CRD Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM by phone.)(crt,Guidry, C)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C.(aty,Brett, Taylor)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C . (aty,Brett, Taylor)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/31/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C identifying Corporate Parent C P G Op Co L P, Other Affiliate C P G Op Co G P L L C, Other Affiliate Columbia Energy Group, Other Affiliate Columbia Hardy Corp, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Partners L P, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Group Inc, Other Affiliate TransCanada PipeLine U S A Ltd, Other Affiliate TransCanada Pipelines Ltd, Other Affiliate TransCanada Corp, Other Affiliate C P P GP L L C for Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C. (aty,Brett, Taylor)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Taylor Edward Brett, Marshall A Hevron, Richard B Eason, II, H Alan McCall on behalf of Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/13/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 30, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 13th JDC Evangeline Parish, Case Number 78,251-A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4010840) filed by Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Service Confirmation, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing)(Attorney Taylor Edward Brett added to party Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Brett, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attales v. Columbia Gulf Transmission Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gulf Transmission L L C
Represented By: Marshall A Hevron
Represented By: Taylor Edward Brett
Represented By: H Alan McCall
Represented By: Richard B Eason, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gulf Transmission Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel W Attales
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?