Flagstar Bank F S B v. Cormier et al
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank F S B
Defendant: Susan Cormier Parks, Nichole Cormier Robinson, Gary Cormier, Nancy L Cormier, Jamal E Cormier, Spenser J Cormier, Edna Bobinox Cormier and Susan Cormier Parker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00980
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Edna Bobinox Cormier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(crt,Crick, S)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Flagstar Bank F S B. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, it is recommended that Flagstar's Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on Flagstar Bank's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 5), set for October 10, 2019, is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Coreil, H)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #5 Motion to Remand, sent to Kristy Massey Finley, Candace Lauren Bowen on behalf of Flagstar Bank F S B. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion to Remand sent to Candace Lauren Bowen on behalf of Flagstar Bank F S B. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Flagstar Bank F S B. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed order)(Attorney Candace Lauren Bowen added to party Flagstar Bank F S B(pty:pla))(aty,Bowen, Candace)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Kristy K Massey, 2106 N 7th Ste 138, W Monroe, LA 71291, re: #3 Removal Order returned marked: Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward. Action taken: Left message with Ms Massey's office on how to update her contact information. (crt,Crick, S)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/31/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette, Case Number 20185632-E (Receipt number 64635007774, filing fee $400) filed by Edna Bobinox Cormier. (Attachments: #1 State court petition, #2 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstar Bank F S B v. Cormier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cormier Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Cormier Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal E Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spenser J Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Bobinox Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cormier Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank F S B
Represented By: Kristy K Massey
Represented By: Candace Lauren Bowen
Represented By: Kristy Massey Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?