Lotief v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System et al
Plaintiff: Michael P Lotief
Defendant: Bryan Maggard, Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, E Joseph Savoie and Jessica Clarke Leger
Petitioner: Sarah Koeppen, Chelsea Lotief, Doni Sanders, Miranda Grotenhuis and Teryn Haley Pritchett
Case Number: 6:2019cv00996
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/18/2019. (crt,Nations, S)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2021 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/8/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/15/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 11/5/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/24/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/24/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/24/2020. Discovery deadline 9/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2020. Daubert Motions due by 10/22/2020. Motions in Limine due by 1/20/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/20/2021. Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2021. Bench Books due by 2/5/2021. Trial Depositions due by 2/5/2021. Real Time glossary due by 2/12/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/12/2021. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 9/17/2019. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 17, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTES OF COURT for proceedings held before Judge Michael J Juneau: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/17/2019. Following discussion, the Court set the trial date in this matter for March 1, 2021; the Court set the pretrial conference date in this matter for February 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. A separate Scheduling Order will be issued. Further, the Court ordered that the parties participate in either non-binding mediation with a third-party mediator or a settlement conference with the magistrate judge within thirty (30) days. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E Joseph Savoie . (aty,Fontenot, Cearley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY: District Judge Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 8/6/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that within 20 days attorneys who are not admitted shall either File an Application to Practice in this Court; File a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, or secure substitute counsel admitted to practice in this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/1/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/1/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 31, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00991. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Ruling and Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Granted #7 Motion to Transfer Venue, and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/31/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULING AND ORDER: The #18 Motion to Intervene is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/29/2019. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to #24 Memorandum in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Miranda Grotenhuis, Sarah Koeppen, Chelsea Lotief, Teryn Haley Pritchett, Doni Sanders. (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Request for Leave. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 25-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
February 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Opoosition to Motion to Intervene. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Opoosition to Motion to Intervene by Miranda Grotenhuis, Sarah Koeppen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Order)(Jones, Allison) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Defendants. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limitation and to Strike Incorrect Pleading. The clerk is directed to strike R. Doc. 20 and file R. Doc. 22-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limitation MOTION to Strike. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limitation , MOTION to Strike Incorrect pleading by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 1/25/2019 to edit event and text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to 20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 20 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Defendants. (Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 1/28/2019 Stricken as ordered(ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #9 MOTION to Strike , #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Chelsea Lotief, Doni Sanders, Miranda Grotenhuis, Sarah Koeppen, Teryn Haley Pritchett. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; A, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jones, Allison) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Strike filed by Michael P Lotief. (McElligott, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #7 Pending Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 is CANCELED. Not status report is due at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE AND ORDER: Per the #13 Opposition to Petition of Intervention, for Declaratory Judgment and for Damages, Defendants oppose the intervention of Chelsea Lotief, Doni Sanders, Miranda Grotenhuis, Sarah Koeppen, and Teryn Haley Pritchett (Intervenors). Defendants assert that Intervenors filed a Petition of Intervention just prior to removal being effected in the state court proceedings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Intervenors shall file, within fourteen (14) days of this Notice and Order a Motion to Intervene Pursuant to FRCP 24. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #13 Opposition to Petition of Intervention, for Declaratory Judgment and for Damages is STRICKEN from the record. Defendants may file an amended opposition to the Motion to Intervene Pursuant to FRCP 24 within the briefing delays provided in this Courts local rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall ensure Intervenors receive notice of this Notice and Order within three (3) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Reply Brief in support #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana , #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 12/19/2018 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE Opposition to Petition of Intervention filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana with certificate of service filed by Michael P Lotief. (McElligott, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Strike : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie.(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Supplemental Motion for Extension. Defendants answer due 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice the #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension for failure to show good cause as required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 7, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time answer or present other defenses and objections MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit text (SGO). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/6/2018. (DCB) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674190. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1856160), filed by Jessica C Leger, Bryan Maggard, Joseph E Savoie, Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Fontenot, Cearley) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 7/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotief v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sarah Koeppen
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chelsea Lotief
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doni Sanders
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miranda Grotenhuis
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teryn Haley Pritchett
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P Lotief
Represented By: Theodore G Edwards, IV
Represented By: John E McElligott, Jr
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Maggard
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Represented By: Cearley W Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Represented By: Cearley W Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Joseph Savoie
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Represented By: Cearley W Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Clarke Leger
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Represented By: Cearley W Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?