Total Welding Solutions L L C v. Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C
Plaintiff: Total Welding Solutions L L C
Defendant: Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C, Shale Support Louisiana Holdings L L C and Kinder Mine Asset Holdings L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv01005
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
2 Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 9/16/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Kinder Mine Asset Holdings L L C, Shale Support Louisiana Holdings L L C, Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C.(Attorney Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr added to party Kinder Mine Asset Holdings L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr added to party Shale Support Louisiana Holdings L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr added to party Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Bourgeois, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Welding Solutions L L C. Kinder Mine Asset Holdings L L C served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (aty,Bendana, Alicia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Welding Solutions L L C. Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (aty,Bendana, Alicia) Modified to correct service date and answer due date on 8/26/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Welding Solutions L L C. Shale Support Louisiana Holdings L L C served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (aty,Bendana, Alicia)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kinder Mine Asset Holdings, LLC, Shale Support Louisiana Holdings, LLC. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C, Shale Support Louisiana Holdings, LLC, Kinder Mine Asset Holdings, LLC filed by Total Welding Solutions L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits "A" - "D")(aty,Bendana, Alicia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C (crt,Williams, L)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Total Welding Solutions L L C (crt,Williams, L)
August 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Williams, L)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Total Welding Solutions, LLC. (aty,Bendana, Alicia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shale Support Master US Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4014793) filed by Total Welding Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Alicia Martone Bendana added to party Total Welding Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Bendana, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Welding Solutions L L C v. Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shale Support Master U S Holdings L L C
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shale Support Louisiana Holdings L L C
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Mine Asset Holdings L L C
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, Jr
Represented By: G Trippe Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Welding Solutions L L C
Represented By: Mark S Goldstein
Represented By: Alicia Martone Bendana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?