Enerflex Energy Systems Inc v. 360 International Inc
Plaintiff: Enerflex Energy Systems, Inc. and Enerflex Energy Systems Inc
Defendant: 360 International Inc. and 360 International Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv01084
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to 360 International Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event. See pdf document filed as #6 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing by 360 International Inc (Attorney James P Doherty, III added to party 360 International Inc(pty:dft)) (aty,Doherty, James) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enerflex Energy Systems Inc identifying Corporate Parent Enerflex Ltd for Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. (aty,Curtis, Martha)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to James M Garner, Martha Young Curtis on behalf of Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 360 International Inc (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Martha Young Curtis on behalf of Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 19, 2019 Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst added. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 360 International Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4027281) filed by Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James M Garner added to party Enerflex Energy Systems, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Garner, James) Modified to edit docket text on 8/20/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Modified on 8/20/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enerflex Energy Systems Inc v. 360 International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enerflex Energy Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enerflex Energy Systems Inc
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Martha Young Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 International Inc
Represented By: James P Doherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?