Olivier v. International Snubbing Services L L C et al
Plaintiff: Paige Olivier
Defendant: Steve A Courville, Richard Autin, International Snubbing Services, LLC, Mitchell Paul Dalfrey and International Snubbing Services L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv01178
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Steve A Courville.(Attorney Gregory Guidry added to party Steve A Courville(pty:dft))(aty,Guidry, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Snubbing Services L L C identifying Corporate Parent Superior Energy Services Inc for International Snubbing Services L L C. (aty,Anderson, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Autin.(Attorney Joel P Babineaux added to party Richard Autin(pty:dft))(aty,Babineaux, Joel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Mitchell Paul Dalfrey.(Attorney Joel P Babineaux added to party Mitchell Paul Dalfrey(pty:dft))(aty,Babineaux, Joel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/11/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Christine M White, Jennifer L Anderson on behalf of International Snubbing Services, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/24/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by International Snubbing Services, LLC.(aty,Anderson, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number C193258B (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4044224) filed by International Snubbing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Jennifer L Anderson added to party International Snubbing Services, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Anderson, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivier v. International Snubbing Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve A Courville
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Andrew John Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Autin
Represented By: Karen T Bordelon
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Represented By: Joel P Babineaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Snubbing Services, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Paul Dalfrey
Represented By: Karen T Bordelon
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Represented By: Joel P Babineaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Snubbing Services L L C
Represented By: Jennifer L Anderson
Represented By: Christine M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Olivier
Represented By: Liza Rawls Trahan
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?