Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Plaintiff: Caroline Wilson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv01179
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Scott A. Forman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4099365) by Walmart Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Griffitts, Ryan) Modified docket text on 11/7/2019 (Bunting, M).
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Courtney C. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4099335) by Walmart Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Griffitts, Ryan) Modified docket text on 11/7/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (aty,Griffitts, Ryan) Modified filer and docket text on 10/17/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by WalmartInc.(Attorney Ryan Edward Griffitts added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Griffitts, Ryan) Modified filers and docket text on 10/17/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Kaster on behalf of Caroline Wilson (aty,Kaster, Lucas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Krause on behalf of Caroline Wilson (aty,Krause, Lindsey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Kaster on behalf of Caroline Wilson (aty,Kaster, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroline Wilson, Walmart Stores Inc served 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (aty,Krause, Lindsey) Modified to include service date and answer due date on 10/15/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 15, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Lindsey Krause on behalf of Caroline Wilson regarding #9 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified docket text to reflect filed in error as wrong PDF was attached. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 11, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 5:19-cv-1179 from Shreveport Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:19-cv-1179. Case assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dunford, T)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the clerk transfer matter to Lafayette Division and randomly reassign it to appropriate judge and magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/11/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroline Wilson. Wal-Mart Stores Inc served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (aty,Krause, Lindsey) Modified to reflect filed in error on 10/15/2019 (Bunting, M). Attorney attached wrong PDF.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James Kaster for Caroline Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/4/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for James Kaster to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4066052) by Caroline Wilson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Jones, Allison)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lindsey Krause for Caroline Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/27/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lucas Kaster for Caroline Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/27/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Lindsey Krause to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4059989) by Caroline Wilson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Jones, Allison)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Lucas Kaster to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4059976) by Caroline Wilson. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Jones, Allison)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc (crt,Crick, S)
September 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4044247) filed by Caroline Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Allison Anne Jones added to party Caroline Wilson(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Allison) Modified on 9/10/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Wilson
Represented By: Lindsey Krause
Represented By: Lucas Kaster
Represented By: James Kaster
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Ryan Edward Griffitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Ryan Edward Griffitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?