Gibbs International Inc v. Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C
Plaintiff: Gibbs International, Inc. and Gibbs International Inc
Defendant: Vidalia Industrial Facilities, LLC and Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv01222
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/5/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C by Gibbs International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Holwadel, D) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct motion event (Dauterive, C).
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, identifying Jimmy Gibbs as an other affiliate, by Gibbs International Inc. (aty,Holwadel, D) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text(Williams, L).
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to D Russell Holwadel on behalf of Gibbs International Inc. Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to D Russell Holwadel on behalf of Gibbs International Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/3/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4052512) filed by Gibbs International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney D Russell Holwadel added to party Gibbs International Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Holwadel, D) Modified on 9/19/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs International Inc v. Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidalia Industrial Facilities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidalia Industrial Facilities L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibbs International, Inc.
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibbs International Inc
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?