Dozier v. GoAuto Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Tamar Renee Dozier
Defendant: GoAuto Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01223
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition MOTION to Stay filed by GoAuto Insurance Co. (aty,Veith, Rebekka)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by GoAuto Insurance Co. (aty,Burge, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition MOTION to Stay filed by Tamar Renee Dozier. (aty,Whaley, John)
October 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery. Motion day set for 1/6/2020 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the pending motion to remand (Rec. Doc. 11), which was previously scheduled for December 12, 2019, is CONTINUED and RESET for 3:00 p.m. on Monday, January 6, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Hanna. The briefing deadlines remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/21/2019. (crt,Nations, S)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand, in the alternative, MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 12/12/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand, in the alternative, MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery by Tamar Renee Dozier. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Whaley, John). Added MOTION for Discovery on 10/21/2019 (Dauterive, C). Modified on 10/21/2019 to edit text and add motion event (Dauterive, C).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue LR 23.1 90 Day Class Certification Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/15/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue LR 23.1 90 Day Class Certification Deadline with consent by Tamar Renee Dozier. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,St Pe, Kenneth)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition, MOTION to Stay . Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Williams, L)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition, MOTION to Stay by GoAuto Insurance Co. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Policy Booklet, #3 Exhibit 2 657861 Check Copy, #4 Exhibit 3 Power of Attorney, #5 Exhibit 4 Appraisal policy option)(aty,Veith, Rebekka)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by GoAuto Insurance Co . (aty,Burge, Jason)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GoAuto Insurance Co. (aty,Burge, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/19/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Rebekka C Veith, Kathryn Jessica Johnson, Jason W Burge on behalf of GoAuto Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/3/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20194941I with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4052648) filed by GoAuto Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jason W Burge added to party GoAuto Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Burge, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dozier v. GoAuto Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoAuto Insurance Co
Represented By: Jason W Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C Veith
Represented By: Kathryn Jessica Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Renee Dozier
Represented By: Kenneth D St Pe
Represented By: Stephen B Murray
Represented By: Kenneth W DeJean
Represented By: Stephen B Murray, Jr
Represented By: John R Whaley
Represented By: Benjamin H Dampf
Represented By: Arthur Mahony Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?