In Re: Alpha VesselCo L L C
Plaintiff: Alpha VesselCo L L C
Defendant: Jarmaine Brailey, Roland Bernard, Jr and Timmy Minor
Case Number: 6:2019cv01253
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to John Leslie Young on behalf of Roland Bernard, Jr, Jarmaine Brailey regarding document filed in error as #7 Admiralty Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correctly identify as #7 Admiralty Answer to Complaint, Admiralty Claim. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 ADMIRALTY ANSWER to Complaint in Limitation, ADMIRALTY CLAIM by Roland Bernard and, Jr Jarmaine Brailey . (Attorney John Leslie Young added to party Roland Bernard, Jr(pty:selreq), Attorney John Leslie Young added to party Jarmaine Brailey(pty:selreq))(aty,Young, John) Modified on 10/28/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ADMIRALTY CLAIM by Timmy Minor. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture claim within 6 Answer to Complaint. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 10/16/2019 to assign document number (Dauterive, C).
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Timmy Minor.(Attorney Joseph Frazier Gaar, Jr added to party Timmy Minor(pty:clm))(aty,Gaar, Joseph)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM LIMITATION OF LIABILITY - Amended to correct Claims due date of 5/3/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING CLAIMANTS TO FILE AND MAKE PROOF OF CLAIM, DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF THE NOTICE, AND RETRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 10/3/2019. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 26, 2019 RECEIVED Registry Funds on behalf of Alpha VesselCo L L C in the amount of $250.00, receipt number 64635007849. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified on 9/30/2019 to edit receipt number (Reeves, T).
September 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alpha VesselCo LLC. (aty,Breaud, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4058804) filed by Alpha VesselCo L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, #4 Affidavit of Value, #5 Letter of Undertaking, #6 Deposit for Costs, #7 Notice of Complaint for Exoneration, #8 Proposed order for Ad Interim Stipulation, etc)(Attorney Alan K Breaud added to party Alpha VesselCo LLC(pty:inre))(aty,Breaud, Alan) Modified on 9/26/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Alpha VesselCo L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha VesselCo L L C
Represented By: Alan K Breaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarmaine Brailey
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Bernard, Jr
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy Minor
Represented By: Jacob Houston Hargett
Represented By: Joseph Frazier Gaar, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Welborn
Represented By: Lucas Scott Colligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?