Richard v. Younomics Private Student Loan Trust et al
Plaintiff: Justin B. Richard and Justin B Richard
Defendant: University Accounting Service, LLC, Younomics Holding Corporation, Younomics Private Student Loan Trust, Younomics Holding Corp and University Accounting Service L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv01277
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Younomics Holding Corp identifying Corporate Parent PSLT Holdco I, Inc. for Younomics Holding Corp. (aty,Roth, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Younomics Private Student Loan Trust identifying Corporate Parent Younomics Holding Corporation for Younomics Private Student Loan Trust. (aty,Roth, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Younomics Holding Corp, Younomics Private Student Loan Trust.(aty,Roth, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D Roth on behalf of Younomics Holding Corp, Younomics Private Student Loan Trust (Attorney Brian D Roth added to party Younomics Holding Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Brian D Roth added to party Younomics Private Student Loan Trust(pty:dft)) (aty,Roth, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by University Accounting Service L L C identifying Corporate Parent Transworld Systems, Inc. for University Accounting Service L L C. (aty,Roth, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by University Accounting Service L L C.(Attorney Brian D Roth added to party University Accounting Service L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Roth, Brian) Modified docket text on 10/24/2019 (Bunting, M).
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to University Accounting Service L L C, Younomics Holding Corp, Younomics Private Student Loan Trust (crt,Crick, S)
October 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University Accounting Service L L C, Younomics Holding Corp, Younomics Private Student Loan Trust with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4063689) filed by Justin B Richard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Account Statement, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Petition, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Adam G Young added to party Justin B Richard(pty:pla))(aty,Young, Adam) Modified on 10/2/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Younomics Private Student Loan Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Accounting Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younomics Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younomics Private Student Loan Trust
Represented By: Brian D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younomics Holding Corp
Represented By: Brian D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Accounting Service L L C
Represented By: Brian D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin B. Richard
Represented By: Adam G Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin B Richard
Represented By: Adam G Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?