Adams v. Old Republic Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Amy Claire Adams
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company, Katy Marie Yoch, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C and Old Republic Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01281
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Old Republic General Insurance Group Inc, Old Republic International Corp, for Old Republic Insurance Co. (aty,Hewlett, Linda) Modified on 11/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C identifying Corporate Parents, Wachovia Securities Financial Holdings L L C, EVEREN Capital Corp, W F C Holdings L L C, Wells Fargo & Co, for Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C. (aty,Hewlett, Linda) Modified on 11/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/15/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Their Corporate Disclosure Statements with consent by Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hewlett, Linda)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C, Katy Marie Yoch.(Attorney Linda Ann Hewlett added to party Old Republic Insurance Co(pty:dft), Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C(pty:dft), Katy Marie Yoch(pty:dft))(aty,Hewlett, Linda) Modified on 11/7/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C, and Katy Marie Yoch answer due 11/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/31/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Christian B Bogart on behalf of Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/14/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C, Katy Marie Yoch. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christian B Bogart added to party Old Republic Insurance Co(pty:dft), Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C(pty:dft), Katy Marie Yoch(pty:dft))(aty,Bogart, Christian) Modified on 10/31/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C, Katy Marie Yoch (crt,Crick, S)
October 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Old Republic Insurance Co, Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C, Katy Marie Yoch (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4065139) filed by Amy Claire Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Craig A Davis added to party Amy Claire Adams(pty:pla))(aty,Davis, Craig) Modified on 10/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Old Republic Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Claire Adams
Represented By: Craig A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Marie Yoch
Represented By: Linda Ann Hewlett
Represented By: Christian B Bogart
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network L L C
Represented By: Linda Ann Hewlett
Represented By: Christian B Bogart
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Co
Represented By: Linda Ann Hewlett
Represented By: Christian B Bogart
Represented By: Andrew D Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?