Wilturner v. Old Republic Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilturner
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Larry Howell, Old Republic Insurance Company, Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar Ranger Inc, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co and Old Republic Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01323
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts that support a finding that the parties are diverse in citizenship. These facts must be supported with summary-judgment-type evidence. The plaintiff will be allowed seven days to respond to the defendants' submission. Compliance Deadline set for 1/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/4/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 09:30 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/24/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/30/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 1/21/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/24/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/23/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/24/2020. Discovery deadline 9/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2020. Daubert Motions due by 10/21/2020. Motions in Limine due by 1/19/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/19/2021. Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2021. Bench Books due by 2/4/2021. Trial Depositions due by 2/4/2021. Real Time glossary due by 2/11/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/11/2021. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 12/3/2019. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2019. Following discussion, a trial date of March 1, 2021 and a pretrial date of February 18, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. were selected. A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on December 3, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 11:00 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.) (crt,Guidry, C)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Oliver, Kenny)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Oliver, Kenny)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. (aty,Dill, James) Modified on 10/21/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Larry Howell, Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co.(aty,Dill, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co. (aty,Dill, James) Modified on 10/15/2019 to add Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Landstar System Inc and BlackRock Institutional Trust Co N A to Landstar Ranger Inc and to add Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp to Old Republic Insurance Co (Dauterive, C).
October 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Larry Howell. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see Attachment #1 to [ #5 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 11, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Landstar Ranger Inc answer due 10/16/2019; Old Republic Insurance Co answer due 10/16/2019; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co answer due 10/16/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see Attachment #1 to #5 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Larry Howell, Landstar Ranger Inc, Old Republic Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents)(aty,Dill, James)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/10/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to David Philip Vial, II, James M Dill on behalf of Landstar Ranger, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/23/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Acadia Parish, Case Number 201910811 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4070622) filed by Larry Howell, Landstar Ranger, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Letter from Burdette, #3 Exhibit Lafayette Bone and Joint, #4 Verification, #5 State court notice of filing, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James M Dill added to party Larry Howell(pty:dft), Attorney James M Dill added to party Landstar Ranger, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James M Dill added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Dill, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilturner v. Old Republic Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenny L Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Howell
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger Inc
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Kenny L Oliver
Represented By: David Oliver Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Co
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilturner
Represented By: Harry K Burdette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?