Smith v. GeoVera Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Smith
Defendant: Michelle Smith, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co and GeoVera Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01341
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Victoria Smith. (crt,Chicola, C)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/9/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum with consent sought but not yet obtained by Victoria Smith. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Hair, Galen)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Sever filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/15/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re #5 Motion to Sever by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna) Modified on 11/15/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 12/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Victoria Smith. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Hair, Galen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Sever filed by Victoria Smith. (aty,Hair, Galen)
October 22, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed on 9/8/2019 filed in Case # 134777, 16th Judicial District Court, Iberia Parish, on 9/12/19. Michelle Smith answer due 10/18/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to #9 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Certified State Court Record)(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/16/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Sever . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 12/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Sever by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna) Modified on 10/15/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company.(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Insurance Holdings, Ltd. for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC Iberia Parish, Case Number 134777 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4073461) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Attorney LaDonna Grey Schexnyder added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Schexnyder, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. GeoVera Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Represented By: Stephen Finley Butterfield
Represented By: Seth A Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Smith
Represented By: Trent Jared Moss
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?