Arnolie v. Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Travis Arnolie
Defendant: Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc., Orion Engineered Carbons, LLC, Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services, Inc., Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc and Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv01474
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C identifying Corporate Parent Orion Engineered Carbons SA (OEC) for Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. (aty,Wagar, Nelson)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C.(aty,Wagar, Nelson)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc identifying Corporate Parent Genesee & Wyoming Inc for Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc. (aty,Bradford, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Orion Engineered Carbons L L C answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/20/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Nelson W Wagar, III, Sarah Wagar Hickman on behalf of Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/2/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wagar, Nelson) Modified on 12/19/2019 to edit text (Jones, P).
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency to Nelson W Wagar, III, Sarah Wagar Hickman on behalf of Orion Engineered Carbons L L C regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Jones, P)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Nelson W Wagar, III added to party Orion Engineered Carbons L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Wagar, Nelson) Modified on 12/19/2019 to edit text and indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 12/19/2019 to indicate refiled in its entirety as Document #7 (Jones, P).
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #3 Answer to Complaint, sent to Robert E Landry, Brian Michael Bradford on behalf of Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/31/2019. (crt,Jones, P)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc.(Attorney Robert E Landry added to party Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc and Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Landry, Robert) Modified on 12/17/2019 to edit text (Jones, P).
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc, Orion Engineered Carbons L L C (crt,Jones, P)
November 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jones, P)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc, Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc, Orion Engineered Carbons L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4106632) filed by Travis Arnolie. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Carisa Renee German-Oden added to party Travis Arnolie(pty:pla))(aty,German-Oden, Carisa) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnolie v. Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Arnolie
Represented By: Carisa Renee German-Oden
Represented By: Daniel J Poolson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Engineered Carbons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee & Wyoming Railroad Services Inc
Represented By: Brian Michael Bradford
Represented By: Robert E Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana & Delta Railroad Inc
Represented By: Brian Michael Bradford
Represented By: Robert E Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Represented By: Nelson W Wagar, III
Represented By: Sarah Wagar Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?