Ardoin v. Progressive Direct Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: HEATH ARDOIN
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association, ROBERT C. HANLON, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, U S A A Property & Casualty, Robert C Hanlon and Progressive Direct Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv01579
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2021 09:30 AM in chambers before Judge Michael J Juneau. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 2/27/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/2/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 3/26/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 11/23/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 10/23/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 11/23/2020. Discovery deadline 12/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2021. Daubert Motions due by 1/21/2021. Motions in Limine due by 4/21/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 4/21/2021. Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2021. Bench Books due by 5/7/2021. Trial Depositions due by 5/7/2021. Real Time glossary due by 5/14/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 5/14/2021. Signed by direction of the Court s/Christine Guidry on 2/6/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/6/2020. Following discussion, a trial date of June 7, 2021 and a pretrial date of May 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. were selected. A scheduling order will be issued. (crt,Guidry, C) Modified on 2/6/2020 (Guidry, C).
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTES for proceedings held with Courtroom Deputy: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/29/2020. The purpose of the conference was to set trial and pretrial dates. Proposed trial and pretrial dates were discussed. Counsel stated that they would reach out to Mr. Rhodes to confirm the dates. After the telephone conference, Mr. Higgins contacted the Courtroom Deputy to advise that Mr. Rhodes had a conflict with the proposed trial date discussed earlier. At the request of counsel, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on February 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 01:30 PM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy). (crt,Guidry, C)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER Due to Plaintiff's counsel not being available for the Telephone Scheduling Conference on 1/22/2020 with the Courtroom Deputy, the Telephone Scheduling Conference is hereby RESET for 1/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2020 09:00 AM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy.)(crt,Guidry, C)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY: At the direction of the Court, a Telephone Scheduling Conference will be held on January 22, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference and trial on the merits, with the Courtroom Deputy. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 1-877-411-9748 and using access code 6925887. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2020 02:00 PM in by phone with Courtroom Deputy). (crt,Guidry, C)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Direct Insurance Co. (aty,MacDonald, Ian)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/12/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ROBERT C. HANLON. (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
December 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
December 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Services Automobile Association.(Attorney Jeffrey Allan Rhoades added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft))(crt,Thigpen, M). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number 2019-10631-D with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4130572) filed by ROBERT C. HANLON, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1" to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit List of Parties and Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service, #6 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party ROBERT C. HANLON(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft))(aty,MacDonald, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardoin v. Progressive Direct Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT C. HANLON
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S A A Property & Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Hanlon
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH ARDOIN
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?