Southeastrans Inc v. Landry et al
Plaintiff: Southeastrans, Inc
Defendant: Morgan Landry, Medi Trans, LLC and Jonathan Lester
Case Number: 6:2020cv00086
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Counterclaim. Southeastrans Inc answer due 3/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/3/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Southeastrans Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Crousillac, Taylor) Modified on 3/2/2020 to capture more accurate event (Jones, P).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the #10 Motion To Extend Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's #3 Motion For Preliminary Injunction on 4/21/2020 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. The parties are to submit a list of their witnesses via email, if any, by April 16, 2020. Compliance Deadline set for 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/26/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 10:00 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. The Parties are to contact the Court at 877-336-1839, Access code 2869540 #. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/19/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Southeastrans Inc by Medi Trans L L C, Jonathan Lester, Morgan Landry.(Attorney Kevin M Dills added to party Morgan Landry, Jonathan Lester, Medi Trans L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Dills, Kevin) Modified on 2/18/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of temporary restraining order, MOTION for Status Conference with consent by Southeastrans Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). Added MOTION for Hearing on 2/20/2020 (Jones, P).
February 6, 2020 RECEIVED Registry Funds on behalf of Southeastrans Inc in the amount of $1000.00, receipt number 64635008017. Funds will remain in treasury registry and will bear no interest. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeastrans Inc Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 2/3/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by Southeastrans Inc. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 2/3/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/29/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY:, Please note a change to: date, time, location, and judge associated with this hearing. Telephone Conference set for 1/29/2020 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays.. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/28/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY:, Please note a change to: date, time, location, and judge associated with this hearing. Telephone Conference set for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays.. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/27/2020. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Southeastrans Inc. (aty,Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 1/24/2020 to add document relation and edit text (Jones, P).
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Southeastrans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjie R. Alexander, #2 Declaration of Joseph R. Cipollini, #3 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 1/24/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 1/24/2020 SEE #4 Proposed Order (Jones, P). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 2/3/2020 (Jones, P).
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Landry, Jonathan Lester, Medi Trans L L C (crt,Jones, P)
January 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Landry, Jonathan Lester, Medi Trans L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4157864) filed by Southeastrans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - non-compete agmt)(Attorney Thomas H Kiggans added to party Southeastrans, Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 1/21/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastrans Inc v. Landry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medi Trans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastrans, Inc
Represented By: Thomas H Kiggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?