Mayeux v. Mayeux et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Mayeux, Jr.
Defendant: Barbara R. Mayeux and Renee Marie Mayeux Bordelon
Not Classified By Court: Timothy J. Mayeux and Joey Lynn Mayeux Milazzo
Case Number: 6:2020cv00092
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Edward Mayeux, Jr. Timothy J Mayeux served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (aty,Kreamer, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Edward Mayeux, Jr. Renee Marie Mayeux Bordelon waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (aty,Kreamer, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Edward Mayeux, Jr. Joey Lynn Mayeux Milazzo waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (aty,Kreamer, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Edward Mayeux, Jr. Barbara R Mayeux waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (aty,Kreamer, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Renee Marie Mayeux Bordelon, Barbara R Mayeux, Timothy J Mayeux, Joey Lynn Mayeux Milazzo (crt,Reeves, T)
January 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Reeves, T)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Renee Marie Mayeux Bordelon, Barbara R. Mayeux, Timothy J. Mayeux, Joey Lynn Mayeux Milazzo with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4158600) filed by James Edward Mayeux, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Charles M Kreamer added to party James Edward Mayeux, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Kreamer, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayeux v. Mayeux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara R. Mayeux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Marie Mayeux Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Timothy J. Mayeux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Joey Lynn Mayeux Milazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Mayeux, Jr.
Represented By: Charles M Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?